Acosta v. Parra Perez et al
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Defendant: Ngoc Tran, Thu Huynh, Maria del Carmen Parra Perez and Maria del Carmen Parra Perez Doing business as Lesly's Gifts and More
Case Number: 1:2019cv01224
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Jose Acosta re #6 Amended Complaint. (Moore, Tanya)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Maria del Carmen Parra Perez. (Golden, Rachelle)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Maria del Carmen Parra Perez. Attorney Golden, Rachelle Taylor added. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Philip Mettler, #3 Declaration of Maria Del Carmen Parra Perez, #4 Declaration Rachelle Taylor Golden, #5 Request for Judicial Notice)(Golden, Rachelle)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jose Acosta.(Moore, Tanya)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Maria del Carmen Parra Perez served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Moore, Tanya)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Flores, E)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Thu Huynh, Maria del Carmen Parra Perez, Ngoc Tran* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *Moore Law Firm, P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Flores, E)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jose Acosta (Moore, Tanya)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against Jose Acosta by Jose Acosta. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8444754) (Moore, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Parra Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thu Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria del Carmen Parra Perez
Represented By: Rachelle Taylor Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria del Carmen Parra Perez Doing business as Lesly's Gifts and More
Represented By: Rachelle Taylor Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?