Boyer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen L Boyer
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv01243
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
2 Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
3 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re Attorney, C J Cuneo for unauthorized practice of law before this court signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/1/2019. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
November 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order to Show Cause served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lewis, Shawtina)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the Court's Order Relating and Reassigning Cases (Doc. #15 ), in the interest of efficiency and judicial economy and in light of the lack of timely objection by any party to conducting the Initial Scheduling Conferences in all related cases on the same date and time (see Doc. 16 ), the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for October 29, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston is hereby RESET for November 6, 2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. As part of their Rule 26 conference, the parties should discuss coordination, consolidation, and any other procedure to conserve judicial resources for both pretrial and trial proceedings in the related cases. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference and may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/8/2019. (Valdez, E)
October 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #28 Minute Order, served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Valdez, E)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric John Buhr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Buhr, Eric John added. (Buhr, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alexis Anne Rochlin on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. Attorney Rochlin, Alexis Anne added. (Rochlin, Alexis)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alexis Anne Rochlin on behalf of C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Rochlin, Alexis Anne added. (Rochlin, Alexis)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2019. Added attorney James F. Rogers, PHV for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2019. Added attorney Matthew B. Lerner, PHV for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #23 Pro Hac Vice Order served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Pro Hac Vice Order served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated for attorney JAMES F. ROGERS to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Shawtina)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated for attorney Matthew B Lerner to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Shawtina)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The Court has received and reviewed the Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Matthew B. Lerner, counsel for Defendants (Doc. #18 ). As Mr. Lerner has not attached a certificate of good standing from the court in his state of primary practice as required by the application, the application is DENIED without prejudice. However, the Court will review and consider Mr. Lerner's application if it is resubmitted with a certificate of good standing attached thereto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/2019. (Valdez, E)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated for attorney James F. Rogers to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8485526) (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 20 Minute Order, served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Valdez, E)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated for attorney Matthew B. Lerner to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8481262) (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Kevin G. Lohman for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated,Kevin G. Lohman for C R Bard Incorporated. (Lohman, Kevin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): In light of the Court's Order Relating and Reassigning Cases, in the interest of efficiency and judicial economy, the Court intends to hold the Initial Scheduling Conferences in all related cases on November 6, 2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. However, if the parties have any objection to holding the Initial Scheduling Conferences in the related cases on the same date and time, they shall file their objection, including a brief explanation of any reasons therefore, on or before October 2, 2019. As part of their Rule 26 conference, the parties should discuss coordination, consolidation, and any other procedure to conserve judicial resources for both pretrial and trial proceedings. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/24/2019. (Valdez, E)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING CASES signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/19/2019. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-01243-DAD-BAM.(Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order Reassigning Case served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 16 Minute Order, served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Valdez, E)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2019. (Hall, S)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY for C R Bard Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2019. (Hall, S)
September 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 #12 Substitution of Attorney Orders served on C J Cuneo NCAED. (Hall, S)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing Attorneys C J Cuneo and Richard B North, Jr to submit Pro Hac Vice Application to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Gonzalez, R)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02747.
September 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Civil New Case Documents for LJO, #7 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on C J Cuneo NCAED, Richard B North, Jr NCAED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 5, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #4 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2747-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Kathleen L Boyer. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16851083 filed by Kathleen L Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr, NCAED
Represented By: James F. Rogers, PHV
Represented By: Alexis Anne Rochlin
Represented By: Matthew B. Lerner, PHV
Represented By: Kevin G. Lohman
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr, NCAED
Represented By: James F. Rogers, PHV
Represented By: Alexis Anne Rochlin
Represented By: Matthew B. Lerner, PHV
Represented By: Kevin G. Lohman
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen L Boyer
Represented By: C J Cuneo, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?