(HC) Aleman v. Robertson
Petitioner: Ceasar Aleman
Respondent: Robertson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01272
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Ceasar Aleman. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Dismissed; further, the Court Directs the Clerk of Court to assign a District Court Judge to the present matter re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ceasar Aleman. referred to Judge Drozd; New Case No. 1:19-cv-1272 DAD-EPG (HC),signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/2019. Objections to F&R due 30-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Ceasar Aleman. (Lundstrom, T)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #11 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ceasar Aleman. (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ceasar Aleman. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ceasar Aleman. (Flores, E)
September 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ceasar Aleman. (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Ceasar Aleman re #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/2019. (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-05462.
September 11, 2019 case electronically transmitted to the Eastern District of California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. To Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/7/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; filed by Ceasar H. Aleman. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING). Filed byCeasar H. Aleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Aleman v. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ceasar Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?