CVE Contracting Group, Inc. et al v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tim Williamson and CVE Contracting Group, Inc.
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01286
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by CVE Contracting Group, Inc., Tim Williamson. Attorney Carter, Kathleen added. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Carter, Kathleen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Berube, Bevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-102242 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8459610) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B.Berube ISO Removal, #2 Supplement Re Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berube, Bevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVE Contracting Group, Inc. et al v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron C Agness
Represented By: Bevin Ann Berube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Williamson
Represented By: Brieanna Dolmage
Represented By: Kathleen Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVE Contracting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brieanna Dolmage
Represented By: Kathleen Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?