(HC) Mendez-Barocio v. Valinken et al
Petitioner: Juan Mendez-Barocio
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Kevin McAlenan, William Barr, Richard Valinken and Matthew
Case Number: 1:2019cv01319
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, served on Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's First #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/18/2019. Answer due December 23, 2019. (Orozco, A)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER by William Barr, Matthew, Kevin McAlenan. Attorney Hurley, James Adelbert added. (Hurley, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James Adelbert Hurley on behalf of William Barr. Attorney Hurley, James Adelbert added. (Hurley, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2019. Consent or Decline due by 10/28/2019 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2019. Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2019(Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/24/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Orozco, A)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Juan Mendez-Barocio; #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/23/2019. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for STAY of Removal by Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Juan Mendez-Barocio. (Orozco, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Kevin McAlenan, William Barr, Matthew, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Richard Valinken by Juan Mendez-Barocio.(Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Mendez-Barocio v. Valinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAlenan
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Valinken
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Mendez-Barocio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?