Freeney v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Freeney
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01324
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (McNatt, Christopher)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re Notice of Settlement and joint stipulation and request to vacate the scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/17/2019. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/21/2019 is VACATED. (Joint stipulation to remand or Joint status report filed by 12/9/2019) (Rosales, O.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT AND JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO VACATE THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; PROPOSED ORDER THEREON by Kenneth Freeney. Dispositional Docs due by 12/9/2019. (Scheppach, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Hawley, Alaina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Hawley, Alaina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus, case number CV18002954 by Kenneth Freeney. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8473352) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal (State Court))(Hawley, Alaina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeney v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr.
Represented By: Megan E. Ross
Represented By: Alaina Cathrine Hawley
Represented By: James Anthony Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Freeney
Represented By: John Michael Scheppach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?