(HC) Bahena v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Esmeling Bahena
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2019cv01434
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Judgment, #6 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Civil Rights Complaint Form served on Esmeling Bahena. (Jessen, A)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dated *12/2/2019* pursuant to order #6 . (Jessen, A)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #4 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and ORDER DECLINING to Issue Certificate of Appealability signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/2/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Esmeling Bahena. (Orozco, A)
October 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Esmeling Bahena. (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge (new case number 1:19-cv-01434-LJO-SKO (HC)); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Summarily Dismiss Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/17/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Esmeling Bahena. (Orozco, A)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Esmeling Bahena signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/15/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Orozco, A)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Esmeling Bahena. (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Bahena v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esmeling Bahena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?