(PC) Gilbert v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Charles T Gilbert
Defendant: Michael Sexton, C. Pfeiffer, Kathleen Allison, E. Gonzalez, M. Woods and V. Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2019cv01464
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Charles T Gilbert. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed on Plaintiff's failure to protect claim against Defendants M. Wood, E. Gonzalez and V. Gonzalez; Plaintiff's claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need be dismissed and Clerk of Court shall randomly assign a District Judge to this action re #8 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Charles T Gilbert.;referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/19. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-1464 LJO-SAB (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Charles T Gilbert. (Jessen, A)
November 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order, served on Charles T Gilbert. (Orozco, A)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT or Notify the Court of Intent to Proceed on Claim Found to be Cognizable; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Orozco, A)
November 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Charles T Gilbert. (Orozco, A)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Orozco, A)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charles T Gilbert. (Orozco, A)
October 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Charles T Gilbert. (Marrujo, C)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charles T Gilbert. (Gonzalez, R)
October 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Charles T Gilbert. (Orozco, A)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Orozco, A)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, E. Gonzalez, V. Gonzalez, C. Pfeiffer, Michael Sexton, M. Woods by Charles T Gilbert. (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Gilbert v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?