(PC)Thomas v. Pfeiffer et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Defendant: Contance Waddle, Ralph Diaz, S. Duncan, C. Pfeiffer, Kathleen Allison, M. Hernandez, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, M. Armas, Haro and G. Gebremedhin
Case Number: 1:2019cv01489
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Edward N. Thomas. (Orozco, A)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/19. Objections due within SIXTY (60) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to #6 Findings and Recommendations Requiring Full Payment of Filing Fees, Denial of In Forma Pauperis, by Edward N. Thomas. (Orozco, A)
November 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Edward Thomas. (Orozco, A)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff be Required to Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee in Full #1 ; Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/18/2019. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) Days.(Orozco, A)
October 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Edward Thomas. (Orozco, A)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-01489-LJO-EPG PC. (Orozco, A)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Edward Thomas. (Orozco, A)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Sant Agata, S)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/21/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Edward Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Thomas v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contance Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Armas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gebremedhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?