Association of Irritated Residents v. Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01512
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maharg, Erica)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents. (Maharg, Erica)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Wednesday, January 22, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2019. (Valdez, E)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Orozco, A)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Vitro Flat Glass, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erica A. Maharg* *Aqua Terra Aeris (ATA) Law Group* *490 43rd St, Suite 108* *Oakland, CA 94609*. (Orozco, A)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vitro Flat Glass, LLC by Association of Irritated Residents. Attorney Maharg, Erica A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8534350) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vitro NOI, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maharg, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Maclear
Represented By: Jason Flanders
Represented By: Erica A. Maharg
Represented By: Lydia Vaughan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?