C.F. v. Kern High School District, et al.
Plaintiff: C.F.
Defendant: Brandi Ball, Greg McKinsey, Robert Moore, Ed Watts and Kern High School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv01571
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kern High School District served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Flores, Jose)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Robert Moore served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Flores, Jose)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Greg McKinsey served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Flores, Jose)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ed Watts served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Flores, Jose)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brandi Ball served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Flores, Jose)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPOINTING #2 Guardian Ad Litem, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/18/19. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Orozco, A)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandi Ball, Kern High School District, Greg McKinsey, Robert Moore, Ed Watts* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jose Miguel Flores* *Rodriguez & Associates* *1128 Truxton Avenue* *Bakersfield, CA 93301*. (Orozco, A)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Jose Miguel Flores re #1 Complaint: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Flores, E)
November 4, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8548065 for $400.00 fbo C.F. from Jose Miguel Flores. (Flores, E)
November 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM Regina Fernandez by C.F.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Jose)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by C.F.. Attorney Flores, Jose Miguel added. (Flores, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.F. v. Kern High School District, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.F.
Represented By: Jose Miguel Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg McKinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?