Murphy v. Amazon.Com, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Tom Murphy
Defendant: USX Logistics, Amazon.Com, Inc. and US Xpress
Case Number: 1:2019cv01577
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #6 ) currently set for December 13, 2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is hereby VACATED. Pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) (Fed. R. Civ. P. 78), the Court will take the motion under submission. MOTION SUBMITTED. If the Court determines that a hearing will be necessary following review of the parties' papers, a hearing will be set by the Court. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2019. (Valdez, E)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the MOTION HEARING currently set for Friday, December 13, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/2019. (Valdez, E)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY by Tom Murphy re #6 Motion to Remand,. (Ackerman, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/2/2019. Added attorney Kevin M. Capuzzi, PHV for Amazon.Com, Inc. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc. to #6 MOTION to REMAND and Request for Attorneys Fees. (Miller, Jennifer)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amazon.Com, Inc. for attorney Kevin M. Capuzzi to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8567812) (Miller, Jennifer)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On November 6, 2019 the Court filed an Order of Recusal (Doc. #5 ). Due to reassignment of the case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for February 6, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto is RESET to February 11, 2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Judge McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-01577-DAD-BAM, to be used on all future filings. The parties wishing to appear telephonically for said hearing, may do so with each partyusing the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/13/2019. (Valdez, E)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND and Request for Attorneys Fees by Tom Murphy. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael G. Ackerman, #3 Proof of Service)(Ackerman, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/6/2019. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-01577-LJO-BAM . (Jessen, A)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Orozco, A)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Miller, Jennifer)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Miller, Jennifer)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8549738) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Miller, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Amazon.Com, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USX Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Murphy
Represented By: Michael G. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?