(SS) Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leon Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01584
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare Street* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Orozco, A)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Leon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Leon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?