(PC) Cray v. Correia et al
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Cray
Defendant: C. Huckleberry, F. Correia, M. Franco and M. Nunez
Case Number: 1:2019cv01641
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Joseph L. Cray. (Marrujo, C)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/25/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Joseph L. Cray. (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 New case docs served on CSP-Corcoran. (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/19/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Joseph L. Cray, CDC AP-8224 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joseph L. Cray. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph L. Cray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cray v. Correia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Huckleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?