(HC) Romero v. Koenig
Petitioner: Aneglito A. Romero and Angelito A. Romero
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus and C. Koenig
Case Number: 1:2019cv01642
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Angelito A. Romero. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED PETITION, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/19. Amended Petition due 30-Day Deadline (Attachments: #1 28:2254 Petition Blank Form)(Martin-Gill, S)
December 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Aneglito A. Romero. (Marrujo, C)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-01642-DAD-JLT (HC). (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Aneglito A. Romero. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Aneglito A. Romero, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/19/19. (Marrujo, C)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 USCA ORDER: PETITION TRANSFERRED to the District Court. (Marrujo, C)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Aneglito A. Romero.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Romero v. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aneglito A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelito A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?