Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Marquez et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Maria Guadalupe Ochoa, Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr., Jose L Gutierrez, Brandon Ramos Estrada, Arturo Rocha, Jr., Paul Montemurro, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz, Raymundo Mendez, Maria T Gutierrez, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Cirilo Molina, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Adan Cruz Santos, Karen M. King, Maria Isabel Molina, Bryce G Rose, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Lorenzo Marquez, Maricela Solorio Heredia, Agnes A Rodriguez, Damian Lutz, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Lesley C Rose, Conrad S Maris, Anh M Maris, Gabriel Sanchez, Francisco J Gonzalez and Lorenzo Marquez an individual Doing business as LM Construction
Case Number: 1:2019cv01672
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 67 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lorenzo Marquez.(Schulte, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT MARQUEZ TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. TEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/5/2020. (Hernandez, M)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING Defendant Marquez's #43 Motion to Dismiss or Stay this Action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Directing Clerk Of The Court To Terminate Defendants Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Adan Cruz Santos, Maricela Solorio Heredia, Conrad S Maris, Anh M. Maris, Paul Montemurro, Maria Guadalupe Ochoa, Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Larry Edward Rodriguez Jr., Agnes A. Rodriguez, Bryce G. Rose, Lesley C. Rose, Maria T. Gutierrez, Jose L. Gutierrez, Francisco J. Gonzalez, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Arturo Rocha Jr., Gabriel Sanchez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Raymundo Mendez, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz, Cirilo Molina, And Maria Isabel Molina From This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 11, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION re #61 Order, DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that Plaintiff shall file a stipulation to dismiss certain defendants or a request for entry of default on or before August 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2020. (Hernandez, M)
July 27, 2020 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Liberatore re #59 Order,. (Liberatore, Stephen)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for additional time is GRANTED and a stipulation to dismiss certain defendants or a request for entry of default shall be filed on or before July 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2020. (Hernandez, M)
July 10, 2020 Filing 58 PROPOSED ORDER re REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS, OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO THOSE DEFENDANTS re #56 Order, by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL TO REQUEST FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS)(Liberatore, Stephen)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 7/20/2020 to 10/26/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/2020. (Hernandez, M)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Additional Time to Dismiss Certain Defendants or Request Entry of Default. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file either requests for entry of default or a stipulation and request for dismissal of the defendants who have not appeared in this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/10/2020. (Timken, A)
June 10, 2020 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER re REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS, OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO THOSE DEFENDANTS by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL TO REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS)(Liberatore, Stephen)
May 28, 2020 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
May 28, 2020 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY by Lorenzo Marquez re #43 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Stay, #49 Opposition to Motion. (Schulte, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Liberatore in opposition to #43 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Stay,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Liberatore, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 50 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company in re #49 Opposition to Motion. (Liberatore, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 49 OPPOSITION by Atain Specialty Insurance Company to #43 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Stay,. (Liberatore, Stephen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
April 15, 2020 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER re Defendant's Motion to dismiss/stay by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion to dismiss by Lorenzo Marquez. (Schulte, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION ( Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.), MOTION to STAY by Lorenzo Marquez. Attorney Schulte, Michael Lee added. (Schulte, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #35 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 28, 2020 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 28, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 28, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 28, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 28, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #35 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXTENDING Time for Plaintiff to Effect Service of Process and for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/20. (Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 7/20/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.)(Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2020 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER re [Proposed] Order Of Court Re: Response Of Plaintiff Atain Specialty Insurance Company To Courts Order Requiring Plaintiff To Seek Entry Of Default Or Notify Clerk Why This Matter Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Prosecute And File Proofs Of Service Or Show Cause Why Certain Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Serve re #33 Response to Order to Show Cause by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #32 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Seek Entry of Default or Notify Clerk Why This Matter Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and to File Proofs of Service or Show Cause Why Certain Defendants Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Serve, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2020. Seven Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
February 18, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court moves the Scheduling Conference in order to allow for an answer to be filed. The Scheduling Conference is reset from 2/19/2020 to 4/17/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/10/2020. (Hernandez, M)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 STANDING ORDER in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California. (Marrujo, C)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Atain Specialty Insurance Company served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #10 Order. (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISREGARDING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2020. (Orozco, A)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of ERRATA by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.. (Liberatore, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 ***DISREGARDED PURSUANT TO ORDER #10 *** NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maria Guadalupe Ochoa* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADDITION OF COUNSEL by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Liberatore, Stephen James added. (Liberatore, Stephen)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arturo Rocha, Jr., Agnes A Rodriguez, Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr., Bryce G Rose, Lesley C Rose, Gabriel Sanchez, Adan Cruz Santos, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maricela Solorio Heredia, Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Anh M Maris, Conrad S Maris, Lorenzo Marquez, Raymundo Mendez, Cirilo Molina, Maria Isabel Molina, Paul Montemurro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Francisco J Gonzalez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Jose L Gutierrez, Maria T Gutierrez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Pardini, Julian J added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8590227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, AND C TO COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit D AND E TO COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit F TO COMPLAINT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pardini, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Marquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Guadalupe Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose L Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Ramos Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Rocha, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Montemurro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymundo Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria T Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heriberto Ramos Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirilo Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Guadalupe Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Cruz Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Isabel Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce G Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricela Solorio Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agnes A Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Oscar Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley C Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad S Maris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh M Maris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco J Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Marquez an individual Doing business as LM Construction
Represented By: Joseph R. Beery
Represented By: Michael L. Schulte
Represented By: Michael L. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E. Mulvihill
Represented By: Julian J Pardini
Represented By: Stephen James Liberatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?