Asmar, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Siham Khalil, Charbel Asmar and Antoine Asmar
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01810
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING the Parties' Stipulated Request for a Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/25/20. (Marrujo, C)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by BNSF Railway Company. (Schroeder, Jeremy)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/2020. New Case Number 1:19-cv-01810-JDP. (Orozco, A)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by BNSF Railway Company. (Schroeder, Jeremy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hollomon, Michael)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Schroeder, Jeremy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Powers Hollomon, Jr on behalf of Antoine Asmar, Charbel Asmar, Siham Khalil. Attorney Hollomon, Michael Powers added. (Hollomon, Michael)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Orozco, A)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schroeder, Jeremy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schroeder, Jeremy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-19-006112 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8644353) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proof of Service)(Schroeder, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asmar, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siham Khalil
Represented By: Peter Lazarus
Represented By: Michael Powers Hollomon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charbel Asmar
Represented By: Peter Lazarus
Represented By: Michael Powers Hollomon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Asmar
Represented By: Peter Lazarus
Represented By: Michael Powers Hollomon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Virginia Lauren Martucci
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Jason W. Schaff
Represented By: Jacob D. Flesher
Represented By: Virginia Martucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?