(PC) Warzek v. Valley State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Michael Warzek
Defendant: Paez, Raythel Fisher, Jr., Clements, T. Thornton, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee, Valley State Prison, Timothy Anderson, Keene, Avila-Gonzalez and J. Knight
Case Number: 1:2020cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00027 DAD-GSA (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Michael Warzek. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/25/2020. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 3/30/2020. (Rivera, O)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Michael Warzek. (Rivera, O)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Timothy Anderson, Avila-Gonzalez, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee, Clements, Raythel Fisher, Jr, Keene, J. Knight, Paez, T. Thornton, Valley State Prison by Michael Warzek. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Warzek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER SEVERING Plaintiffs' Claims and Directing Clerk to Open New Actions for Fourteen Plaintiffs Pursuant to This Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/6/2020. First Amended Complaint and Motion for IFP due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form, #2 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Order served on Michael Warzek. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Warzek v. Valley State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raythel Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avila-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Warzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?