(PC) Evans v. Milam et al
Plaintiff: Richard A. Evans
Defendant: S. Sherman, Leffman and R. Milam
Case Number: 1:2020cv00070
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE by Richard A. Evans. (Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Richard A. Evans. (Rivera, O)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #4 Request for an Extension, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/12/2020. ( Objections to F&R due by 3/1/2020). (Orozco, A)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion for Extension served on Richard A. Evans. (Orozco, A)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objection to #3 Findings and Recommendations by Richard A. Evans. (Rivera, O)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Require Payment of Filing Fee in Full Within Twenty-One Days; ORDER to Assign Case to District Judge (new case number 1:20-cv-00070-AWI-JDP), signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/25/20. Objections to F&R Due Within 14 Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Richard A. Evans. (Marrujo, C)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Richard A. Evans. (Rivera, O)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Leffman, R. Milam, S. Sherman by Richard A. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Evans v. Milam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?