(PC) Lane v. Beach
Plaintiff: Everette Lane
Defendant: K. Beach
Case Number: 1:2020cv00147
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Stanley A. Boone* to * Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin* for all further proceedings. (Sant Agata, S)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on Everette Lane. (Sant Agata, S)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Everette Lane in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Rivera, O)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Orozco, A)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Everette Lane. (Orozco, A)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT, by Everette Lane. (Orozco, A)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Everette Lane, CDC V-72502 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on KVSP. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/29/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Everette Lane. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against K. Beach by Everette Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CDCR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lane v. Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?