USA Truck, Inc. v. Jugan Express Inc.
Plaintiff: USA Truck, Inc.
Defendant: Jugan Express Inc. and Jugan Express Inc. a California corporation Doing business as JD Express
Case Number: 1:2020cv00158
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by USA Truck, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs, #2 Proposed Default Judgment by Court)(Jeffries, Kathleen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Jugan Express Inc.* (Martin-Gill, S)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jugan Express Inc. by USA Truck, Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jugan Express Inc. served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 (AMENDED) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jugan Express Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kathleen Collins Jeffries* *Scopelitis, Garvin, Light and Hanson & Feary, LLP* *2 North Lake Avenue, Suite 560* *Pasadena, CA 91101*. (Rivera, O)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Order re Consent, #3 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jugan Express Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kathleen Collins Jeffries* *Scopelitis, Garvin, Light and Hanson & Feary, LLP* *2 North Lake Avenue, Suite 460* *Pasadena, CA 91101*. (Rivera, O)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUGAN EXPRESS INC. by USA TRUCK, INC.. Attorney Jeffries, Kathleen Collins added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8701510) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jeffries, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA Truck, Inc. v. Jugan Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jugan Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jugan Express Inc. a California corporation Doing business as JD Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Truck, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?