Sanchez v. Law Office of Lance E. Armo, et al.
Plaintiff: Angela Sanchez
Defendant: Law Office of Lance E. Armo and Lance E. Armo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00163
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY by Lance E. Armo, Law Office of Lance E. Armo to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Girarde, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Angela Sanchez to #8 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Garcia, Ruben)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) #8 MOTION to DISMISS set for 4/1/2020 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on February 26, 2020. Pursuant to the Standing Order In Light of Ongoing Judicial Emergency issued 2/3/2020 [Doc 6], unless the court specifically notifies the parties of the need for oral argument, all motions filed in NONE civil cases will be deemed submitted upon the record and briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). The hearing date chosen by the moving party (unless modified by stipulation or court order) will nonetheless govern the opposition and reply filing deadlines pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). Motion Hearing that was currently set for 4/1/2020 before Magistrate Judge Oberto is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Lance E. Armo, Law Office of Lance E. Armo. Attorney Girarde, John Paul added. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Lance E Armo in support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12b6 and to Strike State Law Claim Pursuant to CCP 425.16, #2 Notice Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants Law Office of Lance E. Armo and Lance E. Armo's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Court 12b6 and to Strike State Law Claim Pursuant to CCP 425.16)(Girarde, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Garcia, Ruben)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER UNASSIGNING DISTRICT JUDGE signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the inactive senior status of District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, this action is hereby unassigned until a new district judge is appointed. The parties are referred to the attached Standing Order in Light of Ongoing Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lance E. Armo, Law Office of Lance E. Armo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ruben L. Garcia* *Central California Legal Services* *2115 Kern Street, Suite 200* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/31/2020. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Rivera, O)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Angela Sanchez. (Garcia, Ruben)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants by Angela Sanchez. Attorney Garcia, Ruben L. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 1C to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint)(Garcia, Ruben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Law Office of Lance E. Armo, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Lance E. Armo
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance E. Armo
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Sanchez
Represented By: Ruben L. Garcia
Represented By: Marcos Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?