(SS) Khy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Savann Khy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00185
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Savann Khy. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/22/2020, answer due 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certified mail receipts)(Forslund, Jacqueline)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM-285 Forms) (Flores, E)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline Anna Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. (Flores, E)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/10/2020. (Flores, E)
February 5, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Flores, E)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Savann Khy. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Savann Khy. Attorney Forslund, Jacqueline Anna added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Khy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savann Khy
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?