Brown v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: Carolyn Brown
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 1:2020cv00186
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Carolyn Brown. (Robles, S)
March 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order to Reset Scheduling Conference to 5/19/2020 served on Carolyn Brown. (Hernandez, M)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Remand, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 4/17/2020 to 5/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2020. (Hernandez, M)
March 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, served on Carolyn Brown. (Sant Agata, S)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand that Specifically Addresses 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1)(A); Deadline: April 8, 2020 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remain in Madera Civil Court Instead of Federal Court by Carolyn Brown. (Jessen, A)
February 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Consent Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge served on Carolyn Brown. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/13/2020. New Case Number 1:20-cv-186 SAB.(Flores, E)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford.(Downs, Andrew)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Downs, Andrew)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
February 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents, served on Carolyn Brown. (Flores, E)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judiciary Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Madera County Superior Court, case number MCV082926 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8716124) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Materials received with Complaint), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Interested Parties (FRCP 7.1))(Downs, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?