(PC) Turner v. Porter et al
Plaintiff: Dedric Turner
Defendant: H. Adams, M. Porter, R. Patillo, J. Benavidez, A. Ramirez, M. Voong, Richard Arti and Richard Anti
Case Number: 1:2020cv00252
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Dedric Turner. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/30/2020. Consent or Decline due by 5/4/2020 (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on Dedric Turner. (Flores, E)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Barbara A. McAuliffe* to * Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean* for all further proceedings. (Flores, E)
March 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Dedric Turner. (Sant Agata, S)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Non-Prisoner #7 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/2/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dedric Turner. (Rivera, O)
February 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Dedric Turner. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP without Prejudice; ORDER TO SUBMIT Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Non-Prisoner IFP)(Sant Agata, S)
February 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Transfer Order served on Dedric Turner. (Yin, K)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Yin, K)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:20-cv-0348 AC PC) to Fresno (1:20-cv-0252 BAM PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/18/2020; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
February 14, 2020 SERVICE AT THE COUNTER: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dedric Turner. (Coll, A)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dedric Turner. (Coll, A)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dedric Turner.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Turner v. Porter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Patillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Benavidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Arti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedric Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?