Maria Nino v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, et al
Plaintiff: Maria Nino
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wilmington Trust, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., Wachovia Mortgage, FSB and World Savings Bank, FSB
Case Number: 1:2020cv00306
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/23/2020. (Kusamura, W)
April 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Minute Order, served on Melissa Marquez NCAED. (Gonzales, V)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed the MOTION TO DISMISS, Doc. Nos. #6 and #8 , noticed for hearing on 4/27/2020, before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2020. (Gonzales, V)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Maria Nino. (Schorr, Zachary)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ryan C Thomason on behalf of Wilmington Trust, N.A.. Attorney Thomason, Ryan C added. (Thomason, Ryan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Zachary Schorr re #11 Notice - Other: Your document was incorrectly filed as a Notice. The document should be filed with the event Proposed Order, Substitution of Attorney Proposed. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to theCM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Flores, E)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Maria Nino. (Schorr, Zachary)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER by Wilmington Trust, N.A. in re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Spaeder-Younkin, Joan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. in re #8 Motion to Dismiss. (Wu, Yaw-Jiun (Gene))
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Wu, Yaw-Jiun (Gene))
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Wilmington Trust, N.A. in re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10)(Spaeder-Younkin, Joan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Spaeder-Younkin, Joan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Spaeder-Younkin, Joan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Wu, Yaw-Jiun (Gene))
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Joinder/Consent by Defendant Wilmington Trust, N.A. to Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., S/B/M to Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., a national association formerly known as Wachovia Mortage, FSB, a national association, formerly known as World Savings Bank, FSB, a re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Wu, Yaw-Jiun (Gene))
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior, case number BCV20100148 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., S/B/M to Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., a national association formerly known as Wachovia Mortage, FSB, a national association, formerly known as World Savings Bank, FSB, a, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff's Title, Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff, Does 1 through 25, Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Trustee of MFRA Trust 2016-1 c/o MFResidential Assets I, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8763223) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Wu, Yaw-Jiun (Gene))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Nino v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun (Gene) Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Gwen H Ribar
Represented By: Ryan C Thomason
Represented By: Joan C. Spaeder-Younkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Southwest
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun (Gene) Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A.
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun (Gene) Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun (Gene) Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun (Gene) Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Nino
Represented By: Melissa Marquez, NCAED
Represented By: Zachary David Schorr
Represented By: Zachary Schorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?