(HC) Torres v. Ciolli
Petitioner: Jaime J. Torres
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus and Warden Ciolli
Case Number: 1:2020cv00310
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2020. Respondent's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT to File a Response; ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Serve Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2020. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Change Name of Respondent signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2020. Warden Ciolli added as Respondent. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order, #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Jaime J. Torres. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Jaime J. Torres. (Rivera, O)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING Petition with Leave to File a First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/9/2020. First Amended Petition due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Screening Order served on Jaime J. Torres. (Rivera, O)
March 6, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE100045125 $5.00 fbo Jaime Torres 96602-038 by US Treasury on 3/6/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jaime J. Torres signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Jaime J. Torres. (Sant Agata, S)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Jaime J. Torres.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Torres v. Ciolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Ciolli
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?