(PC) Hearns v. Whisnand et al
Plaintiff: Clarence L. Hearns
Defendant: S. Fleming, J. Barba and Andrew Whisnand
Case Number: 1:2020cv00313
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/20/2020. Consent or Decline due by 5/26/2020 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Clarence L. Hearns. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
March 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Clarence L. Hearns. (Rivera, O)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Clarence L. Hearns. (Rivera, O)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CSATF. (Marrujo, C)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Clarence L. Hearns, CDC K-10567 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Marrujo, C)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/2/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Clarence L. Hearns. (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Barba, S. Fleming, Andrew Whisnand by Clarence L. Hearns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hearns v. Whisnand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence L. Hearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Whisnand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?