Arriaga v. ABC Phones of North Carolina, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramon Arriaga
Defendant: ABC Phones of North Carolina, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00375
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION FOR ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION. Based on the Stipulation between all Parties to the present action, and GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFOR, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff RAMON ARRIAGA shall arbitrate his claims against Defendant ABC PHONES OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. 2. This action is hereby stayed until such arbitration is completed. 3. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this case pending the conclusion of arbitration. 4. No later than fourteen days after a final award is granted or settlement is reached, Plaintiff shall file a report advising this Court of the outcome of the arbitration proceedings or any settlement. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/23/2020. (Timken, A)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Joint Stipulation for Arbitration and Stay Action by ABC Phones of North Carolina, Inc.. (Shipley, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-20-100065 by Ramon Arriaga. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8789859) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Reed ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Robert Shipley ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit to Shipley Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit to Shipley Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit to Shipley Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit to Shipley Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit to Shipley Declaration ISO Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit to Shipley Delcaration ISO Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Notice Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure)(Shipley, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriaga v. ABC Phones of North Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Arriaga
Represented By: Ben Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Phones of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Louis Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?