(PC) Fredrickson v. Baniga et al
Plaintiff: Warren Fredrickson
Defendant: U. Baniga and A. Mansdorfer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00398
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Warren Fredrickson. (Flores, E)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/04/2020. Consent or Decline due by 6/8/2020. (Flores, E)
March 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Warren Fredrickson. (Rivera, O)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CCI. (Rivera, O)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/18/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Warren Fredrickson. (Rivera, O)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against U. Baniga, A. Mansdorfer by Warren Fredrickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fredrickson v. Baniga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. Baniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mansdorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?