(PC) Luedtke v. Ciolli et al
Plaintiff: James Luedtke
Defendant: Kathleen S. Sawyer, Daniel Coggin and A. Ciolli
Case Number: 1:2020cv00406
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Adjudge PLRA Unconstitutional by James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
April 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Findings and Recommendations served on James Luedtke. (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/15/2020. Objections to F&R due by 5/4/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Court Order by James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
April 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion),, served on James Luedtke. (Sant Agata, S)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Completed In Forma Pauperis Application; Thirty (30) Day Deadline; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Forward Order to Warden of U.S. Penitentiary Atwater signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. (Sant Agata, S)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00406-NONE-BAM(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Order A. Ciolli or One of His Subordinates to Send Trust Account Statement to the Court by James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
March 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/2020. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP Without Prejudice and ORDER to Submit Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 (BIVENS) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A. Ciolli, Daniel Coggin, Kathleen S. Sawyer by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Luedtke v. Ciolli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen S. Sawyer
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Coggin
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ciolli
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Luedtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?