(HC) Palmero v. Robertson
Petitioner: Peter Palmero
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00413
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order, served on Peter Palmero. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Motions #3 and #14 for Stay on Respondent; ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to File Response to Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/20/2020.(Responses due 30-Day Deadline)(Copies of this order and Documents 3 and 14 served on Jim Robertson, Warden at Pelican Bay State Prison as directed in this order) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Stay and Abeyance by Peter Palmero. (Rivera, O)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Peter Palmero. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Peter Palmero. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00413-NONE-SKO (HC). (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
March 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order to Show Cause served on Peter Palmero. (Rivera, O)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/24/2020. Show Cause Response due within 21 days. (Rivera, O)
March 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Peter Palmero. (Rivera, O)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Peter Palmero re #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/20/2020. (Rivera, O)
March 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #7 Order served on Peter Palmero. (Plummer, M)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Plummer, M)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:20-cv-0569 GGH) to Fresno 1:20-cv-0413 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/20/20. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Peter Palmero. (Coll, A)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Peter Palmero, CDC AB2072 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
March 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Peter Palmero. (Benson, A.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for STAY and ABEYANCE by Peter Palmero. (Benson, A.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Peter Palmero. (Benson, A.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jim Robertson by Peter Palmero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Palmero v. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Palmero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?