(HC) Guzman v. Wolf, et al.
Petitioner: Hugo Guzman
Respondent: Scott Young, Michael Carvajal, David Jennings, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv00594
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY by Hugo Guzman re #5 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Scott, Sharyna)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Michael Carvajal, David Jennings, Chad F. Wolf, Scott Young. (Hemesath, Audrey)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2020. Petitioner has filed petition for writ of habeas corpus requesting his release from federal custody due to COVID-19 concerns. The court has screened the petition and the government is ordered to respond to the petition. The government shall file and serve a response to the pending petition no later than Monday, May 11, 2020. Petitioner shall file a reply no later than Monday, May 18, 2020. (Thorp, J)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00594-DAD-EPG (HC). (Rivera, O)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against All Defendants by Hugo Guzman. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8861967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Sharyna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Guzman v. Wolf, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Young
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Jennings
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hugo Guzman
Represented By: Sharyna LeRawn Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?