Doe #1, et al. v. Hall, et al.
Plaintiff: John Doe #1, John Doe #2 and John Doe #3
Defendant: Margaret Mims and Andrew Hall
Case Number: 1:2020cv00600
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER by Margaret Mims.(Hawkins, Scott)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING #8 Motion for TRO, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/27/2020. (Rivera, O)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Margaret Mims to #8 Motion for TRO,. Attorney Hawkins, Scott Charles added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Notice)(Hawkins, Scott)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY): Plaintiffs have noticed a motion for temporary restraining order for 5/19/2020, seeking injunctive relief against the Fresno County Sheriff only regarding the Sheriff's policy of requiring registered sex offenders to present themselves in person for periodic updates regardless of the offender's susceptibility to illness in light of the current public health crisis. #8 Given the timing of the harms asserted in the motion, the court does not believe it is necessary to hear and decide the motion by May 19, 2020. Accordingly, the County shall have until noon on May 20, 2020 to file a written response to the motion. Upon review of that filing, the court will determine whether a reply will be authorized and/or whether a hearing will be necessary. In lieu of an opposition, and in light of the fact that at least some of the concerns raised by at least one of the Plaintiffs have been addressed by waiving in person presentment, the parties are strongly encouraged to meet and confer in an effort to reach accord on the emergent issues raised in the motion. In light of the fact that no defendant has made an appearance in this case, Plaintiffs are instructed to serve a copy of this minute order on the County by hand delivery today or overnight delivery (to arrive Monday morning). Plaintiffs' counsel also shall email a copy to the Deputy County Counsel who has held himself out as representing the County on this matter and shall place a courtesy phone call to that individual informing him of this minute order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on May 15, 2020. (Munoz, I)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit re Notice of Motion for TRO, #3 Affidavit re Existence of Irreparable Injury, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Bellucci, Janice)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Request to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to Redact Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Bellucci, Janice)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Margaret Mims served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Bellucci, Janice)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Doe #1, John Doe #3, John Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bellucci, Janice)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Andrew Hall* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Janice Madelyn Bellucci* *Law Office of Janice M. Bellucci* *1215 K Street, 17th Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Margaret Mims* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Janice Madelyn Bellucci* *Law Office of Janice M. Bellucci* *1215 K Street, 17th Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Lundstrom, T)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Doe #1, John Doe #3, John Doe #2. Attorney Bellucci, Janice Madelyn added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8864708) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bellucci, Janice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe #1, et al. v. Hall, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Represented By: Scott Charles Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Janice Madelyn Bellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Janice Madelyn Bellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #3
Represented By: Janice Madelyn Bellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?