(PC) Barnes v. Van Ness et al
Plaintiff: Antwoine Deshawn Barnes and Antoine Deshawn Barnes
Defendant: Robles, Van Ness, Gomez and Shaffer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00625
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Uphold 14th Amendment Protection Clause by Antoine Deshawn Barnes. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Antwoine Deshawn Barnes and Kings County Jail. (Rivera, O)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
May 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Antwoine Deshawn Barnes. (Jessen, A)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00625-NONE-EPG (PC). (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Antwoine Deshawn Barnes. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
May 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Antwoine Deshawn Barnes. (Marrujo, C)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiff to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
May 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Antwoine Deshawn Barnes. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Antwoine Deshawn Barnes.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Barnes v. Van Ness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwoine Deshawn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Deshawn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?