(PC) Bland v. The People of the State of California et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Bland
Defendant: The People of the State of California and Superior Court of California, County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2020cv00637
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Joshua Bland. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion for Extension served on Joshua Bland. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/26/2020. Objections to F&R due within Thirty-Days. (Flores, E)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations by Joshua Bland. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Joshua Bland. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/08/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/5/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Flores, E)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Administratively Redesignate Case as a Prisoner Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/07/2020. (Flores, E)
May 6, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Flores, E)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joshua Bland. (Flores, E)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, The People of the State of California by Joshua Bland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bland v. The People of the State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California, County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?