Eriksson, LLC v. Loveland Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eriksson, LLC
Defendant: Loveland Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00703
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/4/2020 to 11/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/15/2020. (Kusamura, W)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY by Eriksson, LLC to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Han, Minsuk)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to CONTINUE the Mandatory Scheduling Conference and Proposed Order by Eriksson, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (McCarron, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Loveland Products, Inc. to #8 Motion to Remand,. (Dempsey, Jennifer)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/23/2020. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the hearing on plaintiff's motion to remand #8 is continued to July 21, 2020 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Defendant's opposition is to be filed no later than June 30, 2020, and plaintiff's no later than July 14, 2020. (Thorp, J)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Hearing and Extend Related Deadlines by Loveland Products, Inc.. (Dempsey, Jennifer)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/2020. Added attorney K Chris Todd, PHV for Eriksson, LLC. (Rivera, O)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/3/2020. The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND by Eriksson, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Ps and As ISO Mo to Remand, #2 Declaration of Minsuk Han with Ex. A-E, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(McCarron, John) Modified on 6/3/2020 changing date to 7/7/2020 (Thorp, J).
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John C. McCarron on behalf of Eriksson, LLC. (McCarron, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Eriksson, LLC for attorney K. Chris Todd to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8918404) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Han, Minsuk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Minsuk Han on behalf of Eriksson, LLC. (Han, Minsuk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-CV-00464-AWI-SAB by Eriksson, LLC. (McCarron, John)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL by Loveland Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Dempsey, Jennifer)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Loveland Products, Inc. (Dempsey, Jennifer)
May 19, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8897803. (Dempsey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eriksson, LLC v. Loveland Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loveland Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eriksson, LLC
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Minsuk Han
Represented By: John C. McCarron
Represented By: K Chris Todd, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?