Center for Biological Diversity, et al. v. United States Bureau of Reclamation, et al.
Plaintiff: Planning and Conservation League, Center for Biological Diversity and Restore The Delta
Defendant: David Bernhardt, United States Bureau of Reclamation and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2020cv00706
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
2 Judge: Anthony W Ishii
3 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Buse, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Gehlert, GOVT on behalf of United States Bureau of Reclamation. Attorney Gehlert, David added. (Gehlert, David)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re-setting the Initial Scheduling Conference for 10/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Pursuant to the reassignment of this matter from Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe to Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, the Scheduling Conference previously noticed for 8/25/2020 before Judge McAuliffe is vacated. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/15/2020. (Rooney, M)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING Case and REASSIGNING District and Magistrate Judges, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/27/2020. New Case Number: 1:20-cv-00706-DAD-EPG. (Rivera, O)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *David Bernhardt, United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of the Interior* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John T. Buse* *Center For Biological Diversity* *1212 Broadway, Suite 800* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-CV-00426-DAD, 1:20-CV-00431-DAD by Center for Biological Diversity, Planning and Conservation League, Restore The Delta. (Buse, John)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Center for Biological Diversity, Planning and Conservation League, Restore The Delta. Attorney Buse, John T. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8900095) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buse, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, et al. v. United States Bureau of Reclamation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planning and Conservation League
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Represented By: Adam F. Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: John T. Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restore The Delta
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Represented By: Adam F. Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?