(PC) Sanford v. Eaton et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Sanford
Defendant: P. Eaton and Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00792
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert L. Sanford. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to the Clerk of Court by Robert L. Sanford. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CCI, P.O. Box 107, Tehachapi, CA 93581 by Robert L. Sanford. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Robert L. Sanford. (Sant Agata, S)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert L. Sanford. (Rivera, O)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Robert L. Sanford, CDC V-25176 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Sierra Conservation Center. (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *6/8/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert L. Sanford. (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Robert L. Sanford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sanford v. Eaton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?