Gonzalez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Juanita Gonzalez
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00982
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
2 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the Order Relating and Reassigning this matter the Scheduling Conference is reset for 10/27/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2020. (Hernandez, M)
July 25, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Boston Scientific Corporation on 7/17/2020, Answer due 9/15/2020 (Fredona, Rebecca)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING Matters and ORDER for Parties to Submit Status Report signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/24/2020. New Case Number: 1:20-cv-00982-AWI-SAB. (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Fredona, Rebecca)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Juanita Gonzalez. (Fredona, Rebecca)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/21/2020. Added attorney Rebecca Fredona, PHV for Juanita Gonzalez. (Sant Agata, S)
July 21, 2020 PAYMENT for #6 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-9006343. (Molinaro, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Rebecca Fredona re #6 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order: Advance payment of a fee in the amount of $225.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using an event in the category Payment of Fees. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Juanita Gonzalez for attorney REBECCA FREDONA to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Good Standing)(Molinaro, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Association of Counsel to Attorney Paul Molinaro: Your filing is entitled Association of Attorney, however, the actual document attached is an Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order. Please re-file your document using the correct event. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Rivera, O)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Good Standing)(Molinaro, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Boston Scientific Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Paul J. Molinaro* *Fransen & Molinaro, LLP* *4160 Temescal Canyon Road, Suite 306* *Corona, CA 92883*. (Rivera, O)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Order re Consent, #5 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation by Juanita Gonzalez. Attorney Molinaro, Paul J. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8997318) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molinaro, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Gonzalez
Represented By: Paul J. Molinaro
Represented By: Nathan William Fransen
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?