Gartrell v. Viking Client Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Rufus Gartrell
Defendant: Viking Client Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01005
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AFTER #5 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/3/2020. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/2/2020. (Hall, S)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Rufus Gartrell. Dispositional Docs due by 11/2/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Viking Client Services, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Viking Client Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas Michal Wajda* *Wajda Law Group, APC* *6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200* *Culver City, CA 90230*. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Viking Client Services, LLC by Rufus Gartrell. Attorney Wajda, Nicholas Michal added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9006826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gartrell v. Viking Client Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Gartrell
Represented By: Nicholas Michal Wajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Client Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?