Ovrahim, et al. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Sharona Ovrahim, Mansour Ovrahim, Oshanna Ovrahim and Eilroma Ovrahim
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Union Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01042
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER REMANDING CASE to Stanislaus County Superior Court signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation To Remand; Order Thereon by Mansour Ovrahim. (McElfish, Raymond)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF TARA HECKARD-BRYANT, ESQ. by Mansour Ovrahim. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Tara Heckard-Bryant, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(McElfish, Raymond)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of ERRATA by Union Pacific Railroad Company re #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Schaff, Jason)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McElfish, Raymond)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Schaff, Jason)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-19-004993 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9022103) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proof of Service)(Schaff, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovrahim, et al. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Jacob D. Flesher
Represented By: Jason W. Schaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharona Ovrahim
Represented By: Raymond D. McElfish
Represented By: Mitchell Evan Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansour Ovrahim
Represented By: Raymond D. McElfish
Represented By: Mitchell Evan Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oshanna Ovrahim
Represented By: Raymond D. McElfish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eilroma Ovrahim
Represented By: Raymond D. McElfish
Represented By: Mitchell Evan Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?