Doe v. United States
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 1:2020cv01052
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The order to show cause filed August 7, 2020, is DISCHARGED; Plaintiff SHALL SERVE the defendant in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m); Plaintiff SHALL SERVE the July 31, 2020 order granting the request to seal documents and requiring Defendant to file a response to Plaintiffs motion to file pseudonymous proceedings along with the summons and complaint; and Failure to comply with this order will result in the recommendation that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/13/2020. (Hernandez, M)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE by John Doe to #9 Order, #11 Response. (Hurst, EJ)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED EVENT (Gonzalez, R)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 EJ Hurst's Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/11/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE by John Doe to #9 Order. (Hurst, EJ)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Doe for attorney EJ Hurst II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9045684) (Attachments: #1 NC State Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Hurst, EJ)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS. FIVE DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/2020. (Hernandez, M)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Seal and REQUIRING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to File Pseudonymous Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *EJ Hurst* *Law Office of EJ Hurst II* *6409 Fayetteville Road, Suite 120* *Durham, NC 27713*. (Rivera, O)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorney EJ Hurst to submit Pro Hac Vice Application to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19cv00467DADBAM by John Doe. (Hurst, EJ)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, EJ)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER , to File Complaint Pseudonymously by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Hurst, EJ)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Federal Tort Claims Act against United States by John Doe. Attorney Hurst, EJ added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9024914) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurst, EJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Represented By: EJ Hurst, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?