Van Camp v. Navient Solutions, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: David Van Camp
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Navient Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01080
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Whittemore, Brian)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER by Navient Solutions, LLC. Attorney Whittemore, Brian S. added.(Whittemore, Brian)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Micon, Samuel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Micon, Samuel A. added.(Micon, Samuel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020; Navient Solutions, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020; TransUnion, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed (Experian), #2 Summons Returned Executed (Trans Union))(Charity, Garrett)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER by TransUnion, LLC.(Miller, Debra)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/1/2020. Added attorney Debra A. Miller, PHV for TransUnion, LLC, (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re Application for Pro Hac Vice re #4 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order, by TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by TransUnion, LLC for attorney Debra A. Miller to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9083681) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Booth, Eileen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, TransUnion, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Garrett F. Charity* *Mcarthy Law PLC* *4250 N. Drinkwater Blvd., Suite 320* *Scottsdale, AZ 85251*. (Lundstrom, T)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, TransUnion, LLC by David Van Camp. Attorney Charity, Garrett F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9034588) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Charity, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Camp v. Navient Solutions, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Debra A. Miller, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel A. Micon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Whittemore
Represented By: Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Van Camp
Represented By: Garrett F. Charity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?