(PC) Casey J. Beck v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Casey Joseph Beck
Defendant: Luong Nguyen and Premila Thomas
Case Number: 1:2020cv01115
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on CCI-Tehachapi. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/12/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Casey Joseph Beck. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Casey Joseph Beck. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Luong Nguyen, Premila Thomas by Casey Joseph Beck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Casey J. Beck v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premila Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Joseph Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?