Hernandez v. Holt et al
Plaintiff: Ernie Hernandez, III
Defendant: A. Holt, Leah Alvarez and J. Dominguez
Case Number: 1:2020cv01127
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to High Desert State Prison, PO Box 3030, Susanville, CA 96127 by Ernie Hernandez, III. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion for Extension served on Ernie Hernandez III. (Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Motion for Extension of Time to file an amended complaint and Motion for Clarification #9 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/17/2020. Amended Complaint due by 10/26/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Amended Complaint re #7 Order and MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, by Ernie Hernandez, III. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/24/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, the Court will recommend to the district judge that this action be dismissed consistent with the reasons stated in this order. (Gonzales, V)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Ernie Hernandez III. (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and Directing Clerk of the Court to Issue Prisoner New Case Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion). (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Ernie Hernandez, III. (Sant Agata, S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Ernie Hernandez, III, CDC BB-8336 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Sant Agata, S)
August 13, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Rivera, O)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ernie Hernandez, III. (Rivera, O)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leah Alvarez, J. Dominguez, A. Holt by Ernie Hernandez, III. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Holt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Hernandez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?