(PC) Antonio Gutierrez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Gutierrez, Jr.
Defendant: Sandoval, California Department of Corrections And Rehabilitation and Doctor Montegrande
Case Number: 1:2020cv01130
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Notice of Error on Captions, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Antonio Gutierrez Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1130-AWI-EPG. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re Additional Defendants by Antonio Gutierrez, Jr.(Marrujo, C)
August 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Antonio Gutierrez Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/13/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Antonio Gutierrez Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/13/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Antonio Gutierrez, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Department of Corrections And Rehabilitation, Corcoran State Prison Substance and Abuse Treatment Facility Corcoran, Montegrande, Sandoval by Antonio Gutierrez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Antonio Gutierrez v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Gutierrez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections And Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Montegrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?