Cleveland v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Cleveland
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and George Ervin Purdue
Case Number: 1:2020cv01140
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend served on Timothy Cleveland. (Hall, S)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Motion for Change of Venue and DISMISSING THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2020. Third Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Motion for Change of Venue and DISMISSING THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT With Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2020. Third Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Timothy Cleveland by Timothy Cleveland.(Sant Agata, S)
August 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Timothy Cleveland. (Hall, S)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/24/2020. Second Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-01255.
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the Eastern District of California (Bakersfield Division) and that this case be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Timothy Cleveland. No changes to parties. (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Timothy Cleveland. (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to file Plaintiff's complaint on the docket. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) [Transferred from nvd on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ervin Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?