(PC) Eric B. Hernandez v. Kings County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Eric Hernandez
Defendant: Kings County Superior Court, Michelle L. Kubik and Kings County Jail
Case Number: 1:2020cv01144
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Eric Hernandez. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Eric Hernandez. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eric Hernandez. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kings County Jail, Kings County Superior Court, Michelle L. Kubik by Eric Hernandez.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Eric B. Hernandez v. Kings County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L. Kubik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?