Vela v. U. S. Government Health and Human Servives, Child Welfare Services
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Defendant: U. S. Government Health and Human Servives, Child Welfare Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv01152
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as RTS, No Such Number, Unable to Forward: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to Isabel Vela at 420 N. G Street, Porterville, CA 93257. Notice of Change of Address due by 11/9/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Jessen, A)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/21/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U. S. Government Health and Human Servives, Child Welfare Services by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela v. U. S. Government Health and Human Servives, Child Welfare Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Government Health and Human Servives, Child Welfare Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?